Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Eugene Hornyak, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Great Britain (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Hermonthis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1919Born
25 Mar 194525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
195636.2ProfessedPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
19 Jun 196040.6Solemn VowsPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
14 Aug 196141.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
14 Aug 196141.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermonthis
26 Oct 196142.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermonthis
18 Apr 196343.5AppointedApostolic Exarch of England and Wales {Inghilterra e Galles} (Ukrainian), Great Britain
12 May 196848.5AppointedApostolic Exarch of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
29 Sep 198767.9ResignedApostolic Exarch of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
16 Nov 200384.1DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Great Britain (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Augustine Eugene Hornyak
Bishop Augustine Eugene Hornyak O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Great Britain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKucura, South Bačka, Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Philadelphia, PA, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
Death PlaceActon, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Kucura, South Bačka, Eparchy of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • sole: CB, 11 Jan 2015
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • opd: CB, 14 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast