Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian)

Philadelphiensis Ucrainorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stephen Soroka, Archbishop
  • John Bura, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Stephen Sulyk, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Ordinariate of United States of America (Ukrainian)
28 May 1913ErectedOrdinariate of United States of America (Ukrainian) (erected)
Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ukrainian)
8 May 1924ElevatedOrdinariate of United States of America (Ukrainian) Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ukrainian)
Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian)
10 July 1958ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ukrainian) Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian)
5 December 1983Territory LostArcheparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Saint Josaphat in Parma (Ukrainian) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ukrainian)
1950302,775195492441,24078183141ap1951
Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian)
1966163,439.0%13610146013151108ap1967*
1968164,679.0%1421215401421895ap1971*
197649,813166,63829.9%1381114933411229113ap1977
1980166,3441131131,47211212107ap1981
199077,00076118788531410980ap1991
199969,08877118878541512778ap2000
200068,000738818394813674ap2001
200167,500676739246812772ap2002
200267,250785838106512272ap2003
200367,250575621,0846511974ap2004
200465,500606669925611274ap2005
200922,50054559381553866ap2010
201014,98056561245753866ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014