Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basil Harry Losten

Bishop Emeritus of Stamford (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1930 BornChesapeake City
10 Jun 195727.0Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
15 Mar 197140.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
15 Mar 197140.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
25 May 197141.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
20 Sep 197747.3AppointedBishop of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA
7 Dec 197747.5InstalledBishop of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA
3 Jan 200675.6RetiredBishop of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA

MicroData Summary for Basil Harry Losten:
Bishop Basil Harry Losten (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Stamford

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Stamford (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015