Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolodymyr Walter Paska

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Tigillava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1923BornElizabeth
2 Jun 194723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jan 199268.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jan 199268.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigillava
19 Mar 199268.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigillava
29 Nov 200077.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
16 Aug 200884.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Wolodymyr Walter Paska:
Bishop Wolodymyr Walter Paska (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,620
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013