Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian)

Pittsburgensis ritus byzantini



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ruthenian)
8 May 1924ErectedApostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ruthenian) (erected)
Eparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian)
6 July 1963ErectedApostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ruthenian) Eparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian) (erected)
Archeparchy of Munhall (Ruthenian)
21 February 1969ElevatedEparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian) Archeparchy of Munhall (Ruthenian)
Archeparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian)
11 March 1977Name ChangedArcheparchy of Munhall (Ruthenian) Archeparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ruthenian)
1949299,305155101651,8131982156ap1951
Eparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian)
1965220,939129161451,52323163119ap1967
Archeparchy of Munhall (Ruthenian)
19701,477140,0001.1%110111341517277ap1981
1976150,764806861,753615084ap1977
Archeparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian)
1980151,60178781,943614084ap1981
1990141,807716771,8411111287ap1991
199975,261649731,0301410585ap2000
200070,5996477199411110485ap2001
200164,986668748781210486ap2002
200260,686649738311310286ap2003
200360,29063972837139885ap2004
200460,10072118372410159684ap2005
200958,9976497380817138279ap2010
201058,763595649181788079ap2011
201258,2006397280822126976ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014