Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basil Takacs (Takach)

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Zela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1879BornVuckovoje, Austria
12 Dec 190223.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 192444.6AppointedApostolic Exarch of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
20 May 192444.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
15 Jun 192444.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
13 May 194868.5DiedApostolic Exarch of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania

MicroData Summary for Basil Takacs (Takach):
Bishop Basil Takacs (Takach) (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch of United States of America

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013