Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Charles Skurla

Archbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1956 BornDuluth, MN
23 May 198731.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 Nov 199337.4IncardinatedPriest of Van Nuys (Ruthenian), California, USA
19 Feb 200245.7AppointedBishop of Van Nuys (Ruthenian), California, USA
23 Apr 200245.9Ordained BishopBishop of Van Nuys (Ruthenian), California, USA
6 Dec 200751.5AppointedBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
29 Jan 200851.7InstalledBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
19 Jan 201255.6AppointedArchbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
18 Apr 201255.9InstalledArchbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for William Charles Skurla:
Archbishop William Charles Skurla (born ) Archbishop of Pittsburgh

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2007
  • i: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2012
  • i/OFM: CB, 19 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 20 Nov 2013