Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nil Yuriy Lushchak, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Flenucleta

Priest of Order of Friars Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1973 Born
2 Jul 199623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
19 Aug 201037.2ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Nov 201239.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
19 Nov 201239.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Flenucleta
4 Dec 201239.5Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jan 201339.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flenucleta

MicroData Summary for Nil Yuriy Lushchak
Bishop Nil Yuriy Lushchak O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUžhorod

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2012
  • ob: CB, 21 Nov 2012
  • c2+: CB, 10 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018