Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Pataki

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1927BornPalmerton
24 Feb 195224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
30 May 198355.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
30 May 198355.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
23 Aug 198356.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
19 Jun 198456.8AppointedBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
16 Aug 198558.0InstalledBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
6 Nov 199568.2AppointedBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
8 Feb 199668.4InstalledBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
6 Dec 200780.3RetiredBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
8 Dec 201184.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Andrew Pataki:
Bishop Andrew Pataki (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Passaic

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2007
  • d: CB, 8 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013