Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andriy Rabiy

Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Germaniciana

Apostolic Administrator of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1975 Born
12 Nov 199924.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
19 Dec 200126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
8 Aug 201741.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
8 Aug 201741.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
3 Sep 201741.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
24 Sep 201741.9InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
16 Apr 201842.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
4 Jun 201943.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Andriy Rabiy
Bishop Andriy Rabiy (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSt. George, Cathedral, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Please contact the Bishop through the Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Aug 2017
  • od/c01: CB, 8 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,516
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 20 Feb 2019

Quantcast