Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Borys Andrij Gudziak

Archbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1960 Born
14 Aug 199837.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 Nov 199838.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Jul 201251.6AppointedApostolic Exarch of France (Ukrainian)
21 Jul 201251.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Carcabia
26 Aug 201251.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carcabia
2 Dec 201252.0InstalledApostolic Exarch of France (Ukrainian)
19 Jan 201352.1AppointedBishop of Saint Vladimir-Le-Grand de Paris (Ukrainian)
18 Feb 201958.2AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
4 Jun 201958.5InstalledArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Borys Andrij Gudziak
Archbishop Borys Andrij Gudziak (born ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSyracuse, NY
Ordained BishopSaint Georges, Cathedral, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2012
  • c01: CB, 21 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Jul 2012
  • c34: CB, 2 Aug 2012
  • i: CB, 27 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,529
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2019
  • i: CB, 18 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 4 Jun 2019

Quantcast