Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sofron Stefan Wasyl Mudry, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1923BornZolocziw
3 Oct 195026.9ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
14 Jan 195531.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
25 Dec 195835.1Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
24 Nov 199572.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Mar 199672.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
12 May 199672.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
7 Nov 199773.9SucceededBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Jun 200581.5RetiredBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
31 Oct 2014³90.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sofron Stefan Wasyl Mudry:
Bishop Sofron Stefan Wasyl Mudry O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów]

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,719
  • prof/sole: CB, 6 Apr 2014
  • d: CB, 31 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 1 Nov 2014