Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yosafat Moschych, C.M.S.A.A.

Bishop of Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note/Previous Titular See: (Congregatio missionia S. Andreae Apostoli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1976 Born
13 Dec 199822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Other
14 Aug 199922.9ProfessedDeacon of Other
26 Sep 199923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Other
15 Sep 200225.9Perpetual VowsPriest of Other
27 May 201437.6ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 May 201437.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis
3 Aug 201437.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis
12 Sep 201740.9AppointedBishop of Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
18 Nov 201741.1InstalledBishop of Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Yosafat Moschych
Bishop Yosafat Moschych C.M.S.A.A. (born ) Bishop of Chernivtsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStariy Rozdil
Ordained BishopOpen Air in front of la Dormition de la Mère de Dieu, Church, Krylos

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Chernivtsi (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2014
  • c01: CB, 27 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,258
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 5 Oct 2017