Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Leo Nelligan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pembroke, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1894BornTignish
7 Jun 192530.7Ordained PriestPriest of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
16 Aug 193742.9AppointedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
28 Oct 193743.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
19 Nov 193743.2InstalledBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
20 Sep 193945.0AppointedBishop of Canada, Military
10 Aug 194449.9ResignedBishop of Canada, Military
19 May 194550.7ResignedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
19 May 194550.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Phoenice
16 Nov 197076.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Phoenice
31 Mar 197479.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Charles Leo Nelligan:
Bishop Charles Leo Nelligan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pembroke

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1937, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015