Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis James O’Leary

Deceased

Bishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1877BornRichibouctou
14 Apr 190022.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 191436.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada
29 Jan 191436.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
11 Jun 191436.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
10 Sep 192043.0AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
8 Jul 193052.8DiedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis James O’Leary:
Bishop Louis James O’Leary (born , died ) Bishop of Charlottetown

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1914, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015