Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Joseph O’Brien

Deceased

Archbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1874Born
6 Jul 189722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
20 Jun 191338.8AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
24 Sep 191339.1Ordained BishopBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
17 May 192954.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
17 May 192954.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amorium
23 Feb 193863.5SucceededArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
30 Aug 194369.0DiedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph O’Brien
Archbishop Michael Joseph O’Brien (born , died ) Archbishop of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeterborough

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018