Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Patrick Roche

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1874BornPlacentia
24 Jun 189723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
26 Feb 191541.0AppointedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
29 Jun 191541.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
23 Sep 195076.6DiedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Edward Patrick Roche:
Archbishop Edward Patrick Roche (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1915, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013