Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Thomas Renouf

Deceased

Bishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1872Born
30 Mar 189522.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
27 Sep 192047.7AppointedBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
8 Dec 192047.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
15 Jan 192148.0InstalledBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
2 Mar 194168.1DiedBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Henry Thomas Renouf
Bishop Henry Thomas Renouf (born , died ) Bishop of Saint George’s

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint John’s, Newfoundland

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,920, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast