Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerald C. Murray, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada

Titular Archbishop of Bizya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1885Born
8 Sep 190721.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Sep 191024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
30 Jan 193044.0AppointedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
7 May 193044.3Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
4 Jun 193044.4InstalledBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
21 Dec 193347.9AppointedBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
22 Jan 194458.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
22 Jan 194458.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bizya
3 Jun 195165.4DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gerald C. Murray
Archbishop Gerald C. Murray C.SS.R. (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Winnipeg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast