Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard Alfred LeBlanc

Deceased

Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1870Born
29 Jun 189827.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 191241.7AppointedBishop of Saint John in New Brunswick, New Brunswick, Canada
10 Dec 191242.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint John in New Brunswick, New Brunswick, Canada
17 Feb 193564.3DiedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Edouard Alfred LeBlanc (VIAF: 316436095)
Bishop Edouard Alfred LeBlanc (born , died ) Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Bernard de Weymouth

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 15 Apr 2019

Quantcast