Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrien André Maria Cimichella, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Montréal, Québec

Titular Bishop of Quiza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1921BornGrotte Santo Stefano, Italy
26 May 194524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
5 Jun 196443.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
5 Jun 196443.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Quiza
16 Jul 196443.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quiza
25 Apr 199675.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
21 Jul 200483.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Adrien André Maria Cimichella:
Bishop Adrien André Maria Cimichella O.S.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Montréal

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015