Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Carter

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1909BornMontréal
6 Jun 193627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
10 Dec 195647.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
10 Dec 195647.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
2 Feb 195747.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
22 Nov 195849.6SucceededBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
3 May 198576.0ResignedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
17 Feb 200292.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alexander Carter:
Bishop Alexander Carter (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sault Sainte Marie

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013