Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Príamo Pericles Tejeda Rosario

Bishop Emeritus of Baní


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1934 BornSanto Domingo
11 May 196632.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
10 May 197541.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
10 May 197541.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gilba
13 Jul 197541.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gilba
8 Nov 198652.6AppointedBishop of Baní, Dominican Republic
13 Dec 199763.6ResignedBishop of Baní, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Príamo Pericles Tejeda Rosario:
Bishop Príamo Pericles Tejeda Rosario (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Baní

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baní.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013