Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ramón Benito Ángeles Fernández

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Titular Bishop of Febiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1949 Born
8 Dec 197728.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Vega, Dominican Republic
23 Dec 197829.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Vega, Dominican Republic
2002¹52.7IncardinatedPriest of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1 Jul 201768.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1 Jul 201768.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Febiana
26 Aug 201768.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Febiana

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Benito Ángeles Fernández
Father Ramón Benito Ángeles Fernández (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Vega, Diocese of La Vega
Ordained DeaconInmaculada Concepción, Church, Cotuí
Ordained PriestSan Agustín, Church, La Vega, Diocese of La Vega
Ordained BishopCentro de Convenciones Sansoucí, Santo Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Santo Domingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2017
  • od/op: CB, 3 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jul 2017