Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Ozoria Acosta

Archbishop of Santo Domingo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1951 BornNagua
2 Sep 197826.8Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
1 Feb 199745.3AppointedBishop of San Pedro de Macorís, Dominican Republic
15 Mar 199745.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro de Macorís, Dominican Republic
4 Jul 201664.7AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
10 Sep 201664.9InstalledArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ozoria Acosta
Archbishop Francisco Ozoria Acosta (born ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santo Domingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,935
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Sep 2016