Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Amable Durán Tineo

Auxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Titular Bishop of Tacia Montana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1971 Born
6 Jan 200028.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
20 Jun 202048.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
20 Jun 202048.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
12 Sep 202049.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana

MicroData Summary for José Amable Durán Tineo
Bishop José Amable Durán Tineo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan José de las Matas, Diocese of Santiago de los Caballeros
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santo Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santo Domingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 2 Jul 2020
  • c2+: CB, 1 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 12 Sep 2020

Quantcast