Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Santiago Rodríguez Rodríguez

Bishop-Elect of San Pedro de Macorís, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1968 Born
24 Jun 200032.0Ordained PriestPriest of Puerto Plata, Dominican Republic
3 Nov 201749.4AppointedBishop of San Pedro de Macorís, Dominican Republic
30 Dec 201749.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro de Macorís, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Santiago Rodríguez Rodríguez
Father Santiago Rodríguez Rodríguez (born ) Bishop-Elect of San Pedro de Macorís

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMamey, Diocese of Puerto Plata
Ordained BishopCentro Deportivo, Universidad del Este, San Pedro de Macorís, Diocese of San Pedro de Macorís

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of San Pedro de Macorís.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 8 Nov 2017
  • c12: CB, 9 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 10 Nov 2017