Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diómedes Antonio Espinal de León

Bishop of Mao-Monte Cristi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1949 BornVilla Trina
22 Jul 197828.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
20 Apr 200050.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
20 Apr 200050.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
2 Jun 200050.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
24 May 200656.7AppointedBishop of Mao-Monte Cristi, Dominican Republic
22 Jul 200656.9InstalledBishop of Mao-Monte Cristi, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Diómedes Antonio Espinal de León:
Bishop Diómedes Antonio Espinal de León (born ) Bishop of Mao-Monte Cristi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mao-Monte Cristi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,777

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013