Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Leónidas Felipe y Núñez

Bishop Emeritus of Barahona

Apostolic Administrator of San Pedro de Macorís


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1938 BornVilla Tapia
25 Mar 196526.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 199961.2AppointedBishop of Barahona, Dominican Republic
22 Jan 200061.3Ordained BishopBishop of Barahona, Dominican Republic
23 Feb 201576.4RetiredBishop of Barahona, Dominican Republic
10 Sep 201677.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Pedro de Macorís, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Rafael Leónidas Felipe y Núñez
Bishop Rafael Leónidas Felipe y Núñez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Barahona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barahona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,686
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2015
  • ab: CB, 10 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Sep 2016