Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Olivier Tremblay, O.M.I.

Auxiliary Bishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Tinum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1970 Born
12 Aug 199423.7EnteredMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
6 Aug 199524.7First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Aug 199827.7Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
22 May 199928.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
21 May 201847.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
21 May 201847.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinum
22 Jul 201847.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinum

MicroData Summary for Pierre Olivier Tremblay
Bishop Pierre Olivier Tremblay O.M.I. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trois-Rivières

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpellier, Diocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame-du-Cap, Basilica, Trois-Rivières, Diocese of Trois-Rivières, Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trois-Rivières.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2018
  • c1: CB, 21 May 2018
  • ob: CB, 22 May 2018
  • c2: CB, 3 Jun 2018
  • c34: CB, 6 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 23 Jul 2018

Quantcast