Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reynald Rouleau, O.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1935 BornSaint-Jean-de-Dieu
195519.1ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
2 Feb 196327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 May 198751.5AppointedBishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada
29 Jul 198751.7Ordained BishopBishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada
16 Feb 201377.2RetiredBishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Reynald Rouleau:
Bishop Reynald Rouleau O.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013