Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis P. O’Connor

Deceased

Bishop of Peterborough, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1884BornBlyth
5 Jun 190924.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 193045.0AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
11 Jun 193045.4Ordained BishopBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
30 Aug 194257.6DiedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Denis P. O’Connor:
Bishop Denis P. O’Connor (born , died ) Bishop of Peterborough

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015