Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Thomas Ryan

Deceased

Bishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1864Born
21 Dec 188723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
6 May 191247.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
6 May 191247.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
25 Jul 191247.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
5 Aug 191651.6AppointedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
21 Dec 191652.0InstalledBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
15 Apr 193772.3DiedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Patrick Thomas Ryan
Bishop Patrick Thomas Ryan (born , died ) Bishop of Pembroke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCurragh, Ireland

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018