Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrique César Fernandes Mourão, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cafelândia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1877BornRio de Janeiro
30 Nov 190124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 May 192547.4AppointedBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
18 Oct 192547.9Ordained BishopBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
16 Dec 193558.1AppointedBishop of Cafelândia, Brazil
10 Mar 193658.3InstalledBishop of Cafelândia, Brazil
30 Mar 194567.4DiedBishop of Cafelândia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Henrique César Fernandes Mourão:
Bishop Henrique César Fernandes Mourão S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Cafelândia

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013