Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Roberto José da Silva

Bishop-Elect of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1965 Born
4 Dec 199429.7Ordained PriestPriest of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Jun 201954.2AppointedBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
17 Aug 201954.4Ordained BishopBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Sep 201954.4InstalledBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Roberto José da Silva
Father Roberto José da Silva (born ) Bishop-Elect of Janaúba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantos Dumont, Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopSão Miguel e Almas, Church, Santos Dumont, Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Janaúba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2019
  • c02/ob/i: CB, 12 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Jun 2019

Quantcast