Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Helder Pessoa Câmara

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1909BornFortaleza
15 Aug 193122.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 195243.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
3 Mar 195243.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Saldae
20 Apr 195243.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saldae
2 Apr 195546.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Saldae
12 Mar 196455.1AppointedArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
2 Apr 198576.2RetiredArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
27 Aug 199990.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Helder Pessoa Câmara:
Archbishop Helder Pessoa Câmara (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Olinda e Recife

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013