Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Marcos de Oliveira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santo André, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1915BornRio de Janeiro
8 Dec 194025.1Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
3 Aug 194630.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
3 Aug 194630.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagis
27 Oct 194631.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagis
26 Jul 195438.7AppointedBishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Dec 197560.1ResignedBishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 May 198973.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jorge Marcos de Oliveira:
Bishop Jorge Marcos de Oliveira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santo André

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013