Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severino Mariano de Aguiar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pesqueira, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1903BornOrobo
23 Sep 192825.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 195653.3AppointedBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
31 Mar 195753.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
14 Mar 198076.6RetiredBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
7 May 199591.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Severino Mariano de Aguiar:
Bishop Severino Mariano de Aguiar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pesqueira

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013