Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Petró

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1918BornSanto Anônio da Patrulha
30 Nov 194426.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 195840.0AppointedBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Jul 195840.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Mar 196445.9AppointedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Jul 199577.2RetiredBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
28 Oct 200890.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Augusto Petró:
Bishop Augusto Petró (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Uruguaiana

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013