Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Estanislau Amadeu Kreutz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1928BornSanto Cristo
28 Nov 195426.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 197243.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
10 Jun 197243.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronana
17 Sep 197244.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronana
21 Dec 197345.5AppointedBishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Jun 200476.0RetiredBishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
6 Jul 201486.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Estanislau Amadeu Kreutz:
Bishop Estanislau Amadeu Kreutz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santo Ângelo

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 7 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014