Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vital Chitolina, S.C.I.

Bishop of Diamantino, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1954 BornTuparendi
25 Feb 198430.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
16 Dec 198431.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
23 Dec 199744.0AppointedPrelate of Paranatinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
19 Apr 199844.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Paranatinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
28 Dec 201158.0AppointedBishop of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vital Chitolina:
Bishop Vital Chitolina S.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Diamantino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Diamantino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,269
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,320
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jun 2014