Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Diamantino

Dioecesis Adamanteae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vital Chitolina, S.C.I., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cuiabá
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Mato Grosso
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 105,406 (40,713 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Oeste 2
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 02, Rua das Camelias 75, Bairro Jardim Eldorado, 78400-000 Diamantino, MT, Brazil
  • Telephone: (065)3336-1213
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Diamantino
22 March 1929ErectedArchdiocese of Cuiabá Territorial Prelature of Diamantino (erected)
Diocese of Diamantino
16 October 1979ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Diamantino Diocese of Diamantino
6 February 1982Territory LostDiocese of Diamantino Diocese of Sinop (erected)
23 December 1997Territory LostDiocese of Diamantino
Diocese of Ji-Paraná
Diocese of Juína (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Diamantino
196698050,0002.0%318214635307ap1967
197058,00060,00096.7%2724511,13736247ap1971
1976140,000160,00087.5%323265,3842345016ap1977
Diocese of Diamantino
198080,30099,90080.4%526312,590376920ap1981
1990177,000190,00093.2%420247,3751214313ap1991
1999206,000258,00079.8%2171910,842213212ap2000
2000207,200259,50079.8%2151712,188233113ap2001
2001206,492258,60079.8%618248,603222713ap2002
2002162,415223,09872.8%516217,734163213ap2003
2003166,800229,60472.6%614208,340143513ap2004
2004177,188248,58771.3%615218,437293613ap2005
2006188,434269,19270.0%715228,565222413ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 28 Dec 2011