Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Canísio Klaus

Bishop of Sinop, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1951 BornArroio do Meio
28 Dec 197928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
22 Apr 199846.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
21 Jun 199846.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
26 Aug 199846.8SucceededBishop of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
19 May 201058.6AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
18 Jul 201058.7InstalledBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
20 Jan 201664.2AppointedBishop of Sinop, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Canísio Klaus:
Bishop Canísio Klaus (born ) Bishop of Sinop

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sinop.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,344
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2016