Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrique Froehlich, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sinop, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1919Born
3 Dec 195233.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
29 Nov 197152.0AppointedPrelate of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
29 Nov 197152.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Iomnium
20 Feb 197252.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iomnium
26 May 197858.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Iomnium
4 Dec 197960.0AppointedBishop of Diamantino, Mato Grosso, Brazil
25 Mar 198262.3AppointedBishop of Sinop, Mato Grosso, Brazil
22 Mar 199575.3RetiredBishop of Sinop, Mato Grosso, Brazil
28 Dec 200384.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Sinop, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Henrique Froehlich
Bishop Henrique Froehlich S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sinop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCêrro Alegre

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018