Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Mário Scalon Angonese

Bishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1960 Born
16 Dec 198929.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
20 Feb 201352.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
20 Feb 201352.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Giufi
28 Apr 201352.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giufi
31 May 201756.9AppointedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Mário Scalon Angonese
Bishop José Mário Scalon Angonese (born ) Bishop of Uruguaiana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUnistalda, Diocese of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uruguaiana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2013
  • c1/ob: CB, 20 Feb 2013
  • c2: CB, 26 Feb 2013
  • c3+: CB, 12 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,777
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 May 2017