Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cleonir Paulo Dalbosco, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1970 Born
25 Jan 199423.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Feb 199928.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 Sep 201848.0AppointedBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
1 Dec 201848.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
16 Dec 201848.2InstalledBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cleonir Paulo Dalbosco
Bishop Cleonir Paulo Dalbosco O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Bagé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarros Cassal, Diocese of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Medianeira, Church, Barros Cassal, Diocese of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bagé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2018
  • ob: CB, 2 Oct 2018
  • c2: CB, 12 Oct 2018
  • c34: CB, 8 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 2 Dec 2018

Quantcast