Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jaime Spengler, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1960 BornGaspar
20 Jan 198221.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 Dec 198525.3Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friars Minor
17 Nov 199030.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Nov 201050.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
10 Nov 201050.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
5 Feb 201150.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Patara
18 Sep 201353.0AppointedArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Nov 201353.2InstalledArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jaime Spengler:
Archbishop Jaime Spengler O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Porto Alegre

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Porto Alegre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2011, Number 9
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2013
  • i: CB, 25 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013