Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edson Batista de Mello

Bishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1964 Born
30 May 199732.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Dec 199732.9Ordained PriestPriest of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
22 May 201954.4AppointedBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
11 Aug 201954.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
25 Aug 201954.6InstalledBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edson Batista de Mello
Bishop Edson Batista de Mello (born ) Bishop of Cachoeira do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Leopoldo, Diocese of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained DeaconSanta Teresinah, Church, Campo Bom, Diocese of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained PriestSanta Catarina, Church, São Leopoldo, Diocese of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopSão Luiz Gonzaga, Cathedral Basilica, Novo Hamburgo, Diocese of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cachoeira do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2019
  • ob: CB, 22 May 2019
  • c2: CB, 7 Jun 2019
  • c34: CB, 27 Jun 2019
  • i: AM, 29 Jul 2019
  • od/loc: CB, 11 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 12 Aug 2019

Quantcast