Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Osvino José Both

Archbishop Emeritus of Brazil, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1938 BornTrês Arroios
22 Apr 196728.9Ordained PriestPriest of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 Jun 199052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 Jun 199052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cluentum
2 Sep 199052.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cluentum
22 Nov 199557.5AppointedBishop of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Jun 200668.1AppointedArchbishop of Brazil, Military
6 Aug 201476.2RetiredArchbishop of Brazil, Military

MicroData Summary for Osvino José Both:
Archbishop Osvino José Both (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brazil, Military

Please contact the Archbishop through the Military Ordinariate of Brazil, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,431
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015