Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Darley José Kummer

Auxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1967 Born
6 Aug 199528.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Jan 199628.6Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
10 Apr 201951.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
10 Apr 201951.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Elvas
8 Jun 201952.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elvas

MicroData Summary for Darley José Kummer
Bishop Darley José Kummer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoca Sales, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopSão José, Church, Roca Sales, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Porto Alegre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2019
  • od: CB, 10 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Jun 2019

Quantcast